U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Addison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 01, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 01, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.