U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - First Step Act]
  • March 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.