U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.