U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Senethavysouk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.