U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ahmad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Release Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.