U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMMOND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • December 09, 2022: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 14, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 22, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.