U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.