U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Proposed Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.