U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2021: [Release Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Text Order]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.