U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2023: [Amend/Correct ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Ex Parte Document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • February 07, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • January 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice-other]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.