U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Relihan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.