U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Seal ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • June 15, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.