U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 06, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2021: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report ]
  • May 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.