U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Asher et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 31, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • September 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 15, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • July 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appeal in Forma Pauperis]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 25, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.