U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Draughon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.