U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lambert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.