U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Purvis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 08, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.