U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 20, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 24, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.