U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.