U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Koonce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.