U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steverson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sequester]
  • July 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • July 28, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.