U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 14, 2022: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 22, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 06, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • December 06, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Amended Pretrial Services Report ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.