U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 14, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 31, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.