U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vang
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 19, 2021: [Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • June 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 31, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 29, 2021: [Discovery]
  • March 28, 2021: [Suppress]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.