U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fajardo-Morena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.