U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.