U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.