U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.