U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00451-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amended Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.