U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stasko
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 19, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 03, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.