U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Document]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 25, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 25, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • August 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.