U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hedaria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.