U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carroll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • April 20, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 16, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.