U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brooks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Proposed Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.