U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maloney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Agreed Order of Payment - USPO]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.