U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dayton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.