U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.