U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larned
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 02, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 07, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2021: [Release Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Relief]
  • June 10, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • April 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.