U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • March 31, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.