U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 24, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arrest]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
  • March 29, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • March 29, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 29, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12B - Modification to Conditions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.