U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pardo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: [Mandate - USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Opinion - USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • April 01, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 21, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 17, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 14, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 02, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 30, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 12, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • May 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 14, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • April 14, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 14, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.