U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stasney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Electronic Record Transmitted]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • January 03, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • December 15, 2021: [Case Number - USCA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 29, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 27, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 26, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • June 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • April 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.