U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00423-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eaker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.