U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPRINGS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Compassionate Release Motion to Reduce Sentence (2255)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.