U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MALY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Garnishment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Quash ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • November 29, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • November 22, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • November 22, 2021: [Application for Writ by USA]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • May 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.