U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:02-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NICHOLSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
  • May 07, 2021: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 30, 2021: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.