U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHOTTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • March 01, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 03, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 15, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • September 13, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 03, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.