U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOSA SOSA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 20, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • July 14, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.