U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MURPHY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 19, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • May 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • March 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.