U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCDONALD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 23, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 16, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Suppress]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.